NH HB1490 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to limits on money judgments in landlord-tenant cases.
Title
Relative to limits on money judgments in landlord-tenant cases.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Twombly [R] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] |
Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. Bill Ohm [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 47 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 26 |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 12 |