NH HB1487 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 307; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 307; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the procedure for withdrawal from the vaccine registry.
Title
Relative to the procedure for withdrawal from the vaccine registry.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Rep. Melissa Blasek [R] | Rep. David Binford [R] | Rep. Dawn Johnson [R] |
Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 307; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2040c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2040c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2040c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/17/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Bradley, Whitley; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1536h and Requests CofC (Reps. Layon, Merchant, B. King, Kofalt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1536s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1536s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1536s, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2022, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0983h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0983h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0983h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2021-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |