NH HB1487 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-121 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-121 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to freedom of speech and association on college campuses.
Title
Relative to freedom of speech and association on college campuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - ITL (Y: 203 N: 121 NV: 21 Abs: 51) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-121 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0829h |
2020-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 49 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 24 |