NH HB1486 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study information technology in the legislative process.
Title
Establishing a committee to study information technology in the legislative process.
Sponsors
Rep. Willis Griffith [D] | Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] | Rep. Timothy Josephson [D] | Rep. Samantha Fox [D] |
Rep. Jerry Stringham [D] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1080h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 165 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-1080h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 165 |
2020-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2020-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1080h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 7-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 66 |
2020-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2020-01-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/19/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 24 |