NH HB1485 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-30 - Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vulnerable users of highways.
Title
Relative to vulnerable users of highways.
Sponsors
Rep. Lenette Peterson [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Clyde Carson [D] | Rep. John Cebrowski [R] |
Rep. Chris Muns [D] | Rep. Donna Schlachman [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. James Verschueren [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-30 | House | Interim Study Report: Recommended For Future Legislation (Vote 13-0) |
2014-10-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/15/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-09-18 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 10/7/2014 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-08-28 | House | Interim Study - Full Committee Work Session: 9/17/2014 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-03-05 | House | Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 1/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |