NH HB1483 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-21 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/14/2022 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of physical force by a law enforcement officer.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of physical force by a law enforcement officer.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-21HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/14/2022 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar)
2022-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/14/2022 03:45 pm Legislative Office Building 202-204
2021-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback