NH HB1481 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-09-11 - Executive Session: 10/03/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to appointments to fill vacancies to at large cooperative school board seats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to appointments to fill vacancies to at large cooperative school board seats.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-09-11HouseExecutive Session: 10/03/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-09-11HouseFull Committee Work Session: 10/03/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-03-28HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 129
2024-03-28HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed DV 186-188 03/28/2024 House Journal 10 P. 128
2024-03-19HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation 03/13/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 26
2024-03-07HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-03-06HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/11/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2024 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-12-11HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 22

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback