NH HB1481 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Lay HB1481 on Table (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-156 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Lay HB1481 on Table (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-156 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the statute relative to medical freedom in immunizations.
Title
Repealing the statute relative to medical freedom in immunizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 175 N: 156 NV: 32 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Lay HB1481 on Table (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-156 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate [&] (Vote Regular Calendar; ) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/14/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |