NH HB1478 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the rate on the tax on transfer of real property.
Title
Reducing the rate on the tax on transfer of real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 13 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 12 |