NH HB1477 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Lay HB1477 on Table (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-143 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting abortions after detection of fetal heartbeat.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting abortions after detection of fetal heartbeat.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 185 N: 143 NV: 35 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-16HouseLay HB1477 on Table (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-143 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
2022-03-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2022-03-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar)
2022-02-11HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2022-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/09/2022 10:00 am State House Reps Hall
2021-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback