NH HB1477 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to annulment of arrests or convictions for possession of 3/4 of an ounce of marijuana, or less.
Title
Relative to annulment of arrests or convictions for possession of 3/4 of an ounce of marijuana, or less.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Remove from Table (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 314 N: 24 NV: 15 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - OTPA (Y: 314 N: 24 NV: 15 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Woodburn Moved to Remove From Table, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0239h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 314-24 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0239h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 25 |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0239h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 14-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 16 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 12 |