NH HB1476 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.
Title
Permitting qualifying patients and designated caregivers to cultivate cannabis for therapeutic use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on the vote of Refer to Interim Study on HB 1476, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Without Objection, Sen. Birdsell Moved the Question, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm or 10 minutes following the end of Session; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 94 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 42 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 12 |