NH HB1473 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0824h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-97 03/12/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring schools to have a special education parent advisory council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring schools to have a special education parent advisory council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 226 N: 97 NV: 22 Abs: 51) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0824h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 226-97 03/12/2020
2020-03-12HouseAmendment # 2020-0824h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020
2020-03-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0824h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 49
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2020 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback