NH HB1472 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reconsider HB1472 (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 187-192 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 86
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to rebates of energy efficiency funds for electric vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to rebates of energy efficiency funds for electric vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-22 - House - Reconsider (Y: 187 N: 192 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - Table (Y: 189 N: 191 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - OTP (Y: 187 N: 192 NV: 10 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2024-02-22 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 188 N: 189 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-22HouseReconsider HB1472 (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 187-192 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 86
2024-02-22HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 86
2024-02-22HouseLay HB1472 on Table (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 189-191 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 84
2024-02-22HouseOught to Pass: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 187-192 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 81
2024-02-22HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Harrington): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 188-189 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 79
2024-02-22HouseAmendment # 2024-0506h: Amendment Failed DV 187-191 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 78
2024-02-22HouseSpecial Order HB1472 (Rep. Sytek): Motion Adopted Voice Vote By Necessary 3/5 02/22/2024 House Journal 6 P. 78
2024-02-09HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation 02/07/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar)
2024-01-31House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/06/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-01-31HouseFull Committee Work Session: 02/06/2024 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-01-22House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/30/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-01-22HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/30/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2024-01-17HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2024 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2023-12-11HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://gc.nh.gov/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2764&sy=2024&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2024&txtbillnumber=HB1472
Texthttps://gc.nh.gov/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/billText.aspx?sy=2024&id=1851&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttps://gc.nh.gov/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=77&sy=2024&lb=H&eb=HB1472&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2024&txtbillnumber=HB1472&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2764
Roll Callhttps://gc.nh.gov/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=78&sy=2024&lb=H&eb=HB1472&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2024&txtbillnumber=HB1472&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2764
Roll Callhttps://gc.nh.gov/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=79&sy=2024&lb=H&eb=HB1472&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2024&txtbillnumber=HB1472&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2764
Roll Callhttps://gc.nh.gov/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=80&sy=2024&lb=H&eb=HB1472&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2024&txtbillnumber=HB1472&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2764

Bill Comments

feedback