NH HB1468 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the legalization of cannabis.
Title
Relative to the legalization of cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - Table (Y: 276 N: 79 NV: 8 Abs: 28) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-02-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |