NH HB1465 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-16 - Lay on Table (Rep. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the appointment of counsel for juveniles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the appointment of counsel for juveniles.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-16HouseLay on Table (Rep. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022
2022-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0614h (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar)
2022-02-10HouseExecutive Session: 01/11/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2022-01-07HousePublic Hearing: 01/11/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2021-12-01HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback