NH HB1464 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/01/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99708430633 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to insurance coverage for yoga therapy as an alternative or substitute for opioids.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance coverage for yoga therapy as an alternative or substitute for opioids.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/01/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: https://www.zoom.us/j/99708430633 - Executive Session to Follow
2020-03-13HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 218
2020-03-11HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Sylvia) 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 1
2020-03-03HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 6
2020-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 23

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback