NH HB1460 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the form of municipal budgets.
Title
Relative to the form of municipal budgets.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Piemonte [R] | Rep. Michael Sylvia [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] |
Rep. Becky Owens [R] | Rep. Chris True [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1096h: Motion Adopted DV 281-8 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 176 |
2020-03-13 | House | FLAM # 2020-1096h (Reps. Carson, Piemonte): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 176 |
2020-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed DV 43-207 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 176 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 68 |
2020-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2020-02-12 | House | Public Hearing: 02/25/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 1 P. 23 |