NH HB1459 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to non-academic surveys administered by a public school or a chartered public school to its students.
Title
Relative to non-academic surveys administered by a public school or a chartered public school to its students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - OTPA (Y: 186 N: 136 NV: 23 Abs: 51) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0282h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-136 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 41 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0282h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 41 |
2020-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0282h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 49 |
2020-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 02/25/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 23 |