NH HB1456 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to state acceptance of the lowest reasonable bid contract and relative to the sale, lease, or transfer of state property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to state acceptance of the lowest reasonable bid contract and relative to the sale, lease, or transfer of state property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 82
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 9-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 40
2018-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-21House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 11

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback