NH HB1455 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to vehicle repairs.
Title
Relative to vehicle repairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Dennis Green [R] | Rep. Kermit Williams [D] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 216 N: 120 NV: 18 Abs: 42) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0970h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 216-120 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 116 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment # 2020-0970h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 116 |
2020-03-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study |
2020-03-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0970h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 38 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-20 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 23 |