NH HB1453 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 72; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 72; Eff. 7/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the traffic safety commission.
Title
Relative to the traffic safety commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 72; Eff. 7/24/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1493e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/12/2018 House Journal 12 P. 29 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1493e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/05/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0428h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 56 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0428h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 56 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0428h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 33 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 11 |