NH HB1452 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to equalized property valuation used to apportion expenses in cooperative school districts.
Title
Relative to equalized property valuation used to apportion expenses in cooperative school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2018-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 7 |
2018-01-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 11 |