NH HB1452 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to jury nullification.
Title
Relative to jury nullification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - ITL (Y: 193 N: 84 NV: 63 Abs: 48) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 193-84 |
2014-02-27 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2014-02-27 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for TBD (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-05 | House | ==Continued==Executive Session: 2/18/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-02-04 | House | ==Cancelled==Executive Session: 2/13/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 |
2014-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 =RECESSED= |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2013-12-16 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Judiciary |