NH HB1451 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to employee work schedules and rest periods.
Title
Relative to employee work schedules and rest periods.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 48 |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 27 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 11 |