NH HB1447 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-03-11 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting state agencies from using face recognition technology.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting state agencies from using face recognition technology.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-11HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
2022-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)
2022-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
2022-02-23HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/01/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
2022-02-03HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2022 11:10 am Legislative Office Building201-203
2021-12-01HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Transportation

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback