NH HB1446 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 13 2022 - 75% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the governing board of recreational therapists and relative to the governing board of respiratory care practitioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the governing board of recreational therapists and relative to the governing board of respiratory care practitioners.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-13HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022
2022-05-13SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13
2022-05-06HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-1669-EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/04/2022 House Journal 11
2022-05-03SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-1699e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/28/2022); Senate Journal 11
2022-03-31SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2022; Senate Journal 7
2022-03-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13
2022-03-16SenateHearing: 03/23/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 12
2022-03-15SenateIntroduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5
2022-03-11HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
2022-01-20HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304
2021-12-01HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback