NH HB1444 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-06 - Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the registration of medical spas.
Title
Relative to the registration of medical spas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-16 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-26 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/04/2022 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 1:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |