NH HB1444 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the adoption of innovative vehicle emissions standards pursuant to section 177 of the federal Clean Air Act.
Title
Requiring the adoption of innovative vehicle emissions standards pursuant to section 177 of the federal Clean Air Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] | Rep. Nicole Klein-Knight [D] | Rep. George Saunderson [D] | Rep. Craig Thompson [D] |
Rep. Chris Balch [D] | Rep. Robert Backus [D] | Rep. Howard Moffett [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-13 - House - OTPA (Y: 179 N: 109 NV: 63 Abs: 45) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Table (Y: 110 N: 178 NV: 63 Abs: 45) [FAIL]
2020-03-13 - House - Table (Y: 110 N: 178 NV: 63 Abs: 45) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0514h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-109 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 180 |
2020-03-13 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Burt): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 110-178 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 180 |
2020-03-13 | House | Amendment # 2020-0514h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 180 |
2020-03-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-03-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0514h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 71 |
2020-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-02-21 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/02/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2020 02:15 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 22 |