NH HB1443 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Removed from Consent (Rep. Meuse) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Removed from Consent (Rep. Meuse) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming the first Monday of March as COVID-19 Victims and Survivors Memorial Day.
Title
Proclaiming the first Monday of March as COVID-19 Victims and Survivors Memorial Day.
Sponsors
Rep. David Meuse [D] | Sen. Debra Altschiller [D] | Rep. David Cote [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Rep. Kate Murray [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Peter Petrigno [D] | Rep. Joe Schapiro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Meuse) 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-11 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Meuse): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/10/2022 House Journal 5 |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 2:00 p.m. Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2021-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |