NH HB1443 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a jury's determination as to the applicability of a law.
Title
Relative to a jury's determination as to the applicability of a law.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Marple [R] | Rep. Daniel Itse [R] | Rep. John Burt [R] | Rep. J.R. Hoell [R] |
Rep. Andrew Renzullo [R] | Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Andrew Prout [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 158 N: 151 NV: 36 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Table (Y: 136 N: 171 NV: 38 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
2018-03-15 - House - OTPA (Y: 158 N: 151 NV: 36 Abs: 47) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Table (Y: 136 N: 171 NV: 38 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2018-03-15 | House | Reconsider HB 1443 (Rep. Hopper): Motion Failed DV 150-165 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 6 |
2018-03-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0478h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 158-151 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 4 |
2018-03-15 | House | Lay HB 1443 on Table (Rep. Burridge): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 136-171 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 2 |
2018-03-15 | House | Amendment # 2018-0478h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 2 |
2018-03-07 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-07 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-03-01 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-03-01 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0478h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 9-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 58 |
2018-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-09 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 11 |