NH HB1441 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/11/2022; Chapter 18; I. Sec 2 eff 12/31/2027- II Rem eff 04/11/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to organize the observance of the 250th anniversary of the declaration of independence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to organize the observance of the 250th anniversary of the declaration of independence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-12HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 04/11/2022; Chapter 18; I. Sec 2 eff 12/31/2027- II Rem eff 04/11/2022
2022-04-04HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
2022-04-01SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 03/31/2022); Senate Journal 8
2022-03-29HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-1224EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
2022-03-29SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-1224e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 03/24/2022); Senate Journal 7
2022-03-17SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5
2022-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2022-03-02SenateHearing: 03/09/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 10
2022-03-01SenateIntroduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5
2022-02-23HouseAmendment # 2022-0148h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-02-16HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2022-0148h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-01-28HouseExecutive Session: 01/20/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2022-01-21HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0148h (Vote ; 13-0)
2022-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/14/2022 03:45 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203
2021-12-01HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback