NH HB1441 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the office of the ombudsman in the department of state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing the office of the ombudsman in the department of state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-05SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/05/2018; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-29SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 04/05/2018; Senate Calendar 15
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/28/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7
2018-02-22HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0069h: Motion Adopted DV 190-148 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 31
2018-02-22HouseAmendment # 2018-0069h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 31
2018-02-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-02-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0069h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 17
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 11

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback