NH HB144 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB144
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-13 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to absentee ballot request forms.
Title
Relative to absentee ballot request forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 10/06/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-03-11 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-08 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757 |
2021-03-04 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2021 11:15 am Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91092569734 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:20 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary) |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 36 |
Same As/Similar To
HB144 (Carry Over) 2021-10-13 - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308