NH HB1437 | 2018 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 288-36 02/15/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]


Relative to tattoos on state law enforcement officers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Relative to tattoos on state law enforcement officers.



2018-02-15HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 288-36 02/15/2018
2018-02-09HouseSpecial Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection
2018-02-08HouseRemoved from Consent (Rep. Stone) 02/08/2018
2018-01-23HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 6
2018-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/16/2018 Legislative Office Building 204
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204
2017-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 10

New Hampshire State Sources

Bill Comments