NH HB1434 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Honor and Remember Flag.
Title
Relative to the Honor and Remember Flag.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. Jaci Grote [D] | Rep. Peggy Balboni [D] |
Rep. Skip Rollins [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2024 House Journal 4 P. 11 |
2024-01-30 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/25/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-01-17 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 01:20 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 20 |