NH HB1434 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 3 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-09-10 - Executive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
Hearing: Oct 23 @ 10:00 am in am Legislative Office Building306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the New Hampshire council on developmental disabilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the New Hampshire council on developmental disabilities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-10HouseExecutive Session: 10/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
2018-08-15HouseInterim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building306
2018-03-06HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 35
2018-02-23HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/06/2018 (Vote 12-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 19
2018-02-23HouseExecutive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-06House==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-01House==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/08/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-17HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306
2017-11-03HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 10

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback