NH HB1430 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study attainment of a clean-energy electric grid by 2030.
Title
Establishing a commission to study attainment of a clean-energy electric grid by 2030.
Sponsors
Rep. Kat McGhee [D] | Rep. Chris Balch [D] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-13 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0519h: Motion Adopted DV 169-100 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 180 |
2020-03-13 | House | Amendment # 2020-0519h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 180 |
2020-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0519h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 71 |
2020-02-05 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 22 |