NH HB143 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to wiretapping to record conversations related to domestic violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to wiretapping to record conversations related to domestic violence.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
2023-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB 143 01/19/2023 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 3
2023-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2023-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204
2022-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback