NH HB143 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 183; I. Sec 1-5 Eff: 01/01/2022 II. Sec. 6-8 Eff: 10/09/2021 III. Rem. Eff: 09/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to an electronic prescription drug program and establishing licensure and requirements for licensed social workers, licensed social work associates, and social work conditional licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to an electronic prescription drug program and establishing licensure and requirements for licensed social workers, licensed social work associates, and social work conditional licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 242 N: 114 NV: 9 Abs: 31) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 243 N: 114 NV: 41 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-16HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 183; I. Sec 1-5 Eff: 01/01/2022 II. Sec. 6-8 Eff: 10/09/2021 III. Rem. Eff: 09/09/2021
2021-07-23HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-21SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1589s (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 10
2021-05-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1589s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1589s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-19SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1589s, 05/27/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 25
2021-04-29SenateRemote Hearing: 05/05/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0444h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 243-114 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 75
2021-04-08HouseAmendment # 2021-0444h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 75
2021-03-02HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-02HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0444h (Vote 19-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 47
2021-02-16HousePublic Hearing: 02/16/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94563888809 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 36

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback