NH HB143 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB143
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to disqualification of members of local land use boards.
Title
Relative to disqualification of members of local land use boards.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McLean [R] | Rep. Kat McGhee [D] | Rep. Michelle St. John [D] | Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] |
Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0518h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 21 |
2020-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2019-0518h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 21 |
2019-11-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0518h (NT) (Vote 15-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 27 |
2019-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-06-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 06/27/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-06-11 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 02/26/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-02-14 | House | Recommit (Rep. Carson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 70 |
2019-01-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-01-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 17 |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 39 |
Same As/Similar To
HB143 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate