NH HB1428 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-17 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to roadside memorials.
Title
Relative to roadside memorials.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Gannon, Ward, Cavanaugh; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Gannon Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. McConkey, Milz, J. Graham, Ebel 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1606s and Requests CofC (Rep. McConkey): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1606s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1606s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1606s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0432h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 101 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0432h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 101 |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0432h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 45 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-01-31 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-01-17 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-11-06 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 1 P. 10 |