NH HB1423 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/07/2016; Chapter 213; I. RSA 318-B:41 II(a)(4) and RSA 318-B:41 IV(a)(4) and section 9 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 10 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/7/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/07/2016; Chapter 213; I. RSA 318-B:41 II(a)(4) and RSA 318-B:41 IV(a)(4) and section 9 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 10 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/7/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to rulemaking for prescribing controlled drugs.
Title
Relative to rulemaking for prescribing controlled drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. Molly Kelly [D] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Rep. James MacKay [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 06/07/2016; Chapter 213; I. RSA 318-B:41 II(a)(4) and RSA 318-B:41 IV(a)(4) and section 9 of this act shall take effect as provided in section 10 ; II. Rem. eff. 6/7/2016 |
2016-05-27 | House | Enrolled 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 29 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/19/2016); Senate Journal 19 |
2016-05-11 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1502s (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 3 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1502s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2016; Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1502s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2016 Senate Journal 15 |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1502s, 04/28/2016; Senate Calendar 16 |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2016, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2016 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 10 |
2016-03-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0872h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 37 |
2016-03-09 | House | Amendment #2016-0872h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 37 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0872h for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 22 |
2016-03-03 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/02/2016 07:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/16/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building205 |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 4 P. 14 |