NH HB1420 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the use of force at New Hampshire national guard facilities.
Title
Relative to the use of force at New Hampshire national guard facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. John Graham [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0091h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 23 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0091h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 23 |
2020-02-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0091h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 14 |
2020-01-10 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2020 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 206 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs House Journal 1 P. 21 |