NH HB1420 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 71; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 71; Eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a criminal penalty for driving after certification as an habitual offender.
Title
Relative to a criminal penalty for driving after certification as an habitual offender.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 71; Eff. 1/1/2019 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 22 |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/22/2018 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 15 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-11-03 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 10 |