NH HB142 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Making a capital appropriation for construction of a new tenth circuit district court facility in Hampton.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Making a capital appropriation for construction of a new tenth circuit district court facility in Hampton.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-02HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 6
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/02/2017 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 6
2017-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2017 Legislative Office Building 201
2017-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201
2016-12-21HouseIntroduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 2 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback