NH HB142 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-23 - Law Without Signature on 7/21/2015; Chapter 270; Section 2 Effective 9/1/2015, Remaining Effective 9/19/2015; NH Constitution, Article 44, Part II
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to student social media policies by educational institutions and nonpublic sessions under the right-to-know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to student social media policies by educational institutions and nonpublic sessions under the right-to-know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-23HouseLaw Without Signature on 7/21/2015; Chapter 270; Section 2 Effective 9/1/2015, Remaining Effective 9/19/2015; NH Constitution, Article 44, Part II
2015-07-09HouseEnrolled (in recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2142
2015-07-09SenateEnrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-07-01HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2355EBA (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2140
2015-07-01SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2355e, New Title, Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19
2015-06-24HouseConference Committee Report 2185c: Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 54, PG. 2122
2015-06-24SenateConference Committee Report 2185c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19
2015-06-18SenateConference Committee Report #2015-2185c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed
2015-06-11HouseConference Committee Meeting: 6/15/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-06-11SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Reagan, Avard and Watters
2015-06-11SenateSen. Reagan accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18
2015-06-05HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps Balcom, Adams, V. Sullivan, K. Rogers (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1950
2015-06-05HouseHouse Non-Concurs and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1950
2015-04-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1357s, 1504s, New Title, and 1511s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12
2015-04-30SenateSen. Watters Floor Amendment #2015-1511s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12
2015-04-30SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2015-1504s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12
2015-04-30SenateCommittee Amendment 1357s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2015-04-17Senate=== RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1357s, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19
2015-04-16Senate=== CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1357s, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18
2015-03-19SenateHearing: 3/24/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14
2015-03-05SenateIntroduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8
2015-03-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0424h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 578-579
2015-03-04HouseFloor Amendment #0597h: Amendment Failed DV 112-249; House Journal 22, PG. 579
2015-03-04HouseReconsider Floor Amendment #0597h (Rep W. O'Brien): Motion Adopted DV 196-165; House Journal 22, PG. 578
2015-03-04HouseFloor Amendment #0597h (Rep Hill): Amendment Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 578
2015-03-04HouseAmendment #0424h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 578
2015-02-20HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0424h for Mar 4 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 356
2015-02-11HouseExecutive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-02-04House===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2015-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 2/12/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207
2015-01-29House===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 2/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 209

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback