NH HB142 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0066
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to sales of artificial flowers and miniature flags.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to sales of artificial flowers and miniature flags.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 House Signed by Governor 05/16/2011; Effective 01/01/2012; Chapter 0066
2011-05-04 House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490
2011-05-04 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318
2011-04-27 Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #1469 Adopted; Senate Journal 15, Pg.292
2011-04-27 House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-1469e Adopted; House Journal 40, PG.1388
2011-04-13 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 12, Pg.254
2011-04-13 Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 12, Pg.245
2011-03-30 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/13/11; Senate Calendar 19
2011-03-24 Senate Hearing: 3/29/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:10 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17
2011-03-16 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce
2011-02-09 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 16, PG.309
2011-02-03 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 9 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 12, PG.200
2011-01-26 House Executive Session: 2/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2011-01-19 House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/25/2011 11:0 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2011-01-13 House Public Hearing: 1/19/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302
2011-01-11 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 174

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback