NH HB1419 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to New Hampshire banks offering small dollar loans and credit building products.
Title
Relative to New Hampshire banks offering small dollar loans and credit building products.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Thompson [D] | Rep. Elaine French [D] | Rep. Wendy Thomas [D] | Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] |
Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 7 |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 6 |
2020-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-02-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2020-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-12-03 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 21 |