NH HB1418 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Executive Session: 09/23/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98901909120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing funds of the department of agriculture to be used for increasing farm energy efficiency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing funds of the department of agriculture to be used for increasing farm energy efficiency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16HouseExecutive Session: 09/23/2020 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/98901909120
2020-03-11HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 22
2020-03-03HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 14
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/27/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2020-02-12HousePublic Hearing: 02/18/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback